CO SB052 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expansion of an emergency medical service provider's scope of practice.
Title
Emergency Medical Service Provider Scope Of Practice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-052 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-052 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-052 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-052 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |