CO SB051 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning license plates, and, in connection therewith, specifying that, in order to minimize potential lost registration revenue, the license plates of a motor vehicle that is classified as Class C personal property expire upon the sale or transfer of the motor vehicle, and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License Plate Expiration On Change Of Ownership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-15 - House - House: MISCELLANEOUS Repass (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: MISCELLANEOUS Recede (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Adhere (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-051 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-051, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-051, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-11 Governor Vetoed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-15SenateHouse Considered Senate Adherence - Result was to Recede
2020-06-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere
2020-06-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-11HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-10HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-10HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-09HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-03SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-05-26SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-13SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-11SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-28SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-051
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_051_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_051_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_051_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_051_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_051_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_051_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d3a1be264bba26d6872584fd007d8ccc-sb20-051-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f725bbe4ab942c0b8725850b007b775c-sb20-051-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d3a1be264bba26d6872584fd007d8ccc-sb20-051-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d33f5e9b49009df68725852a004f1890-sb20-051-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d33f5e9b49009df68725852a004f1890-sb20-051-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d33f5e9b49009df68725852a004f1890-sb20-051-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-051vote5e7660
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/51ae7972bf511fcb87258582007832c1-sb20-051-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/935252ef7f83f91c87258583004ee078-sb20-051-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/935252ef7f83f91c87258583004ee078-sb20-051-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f725bbe4ab942c0b8725850b007b775c-sb20-051-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-051vote622b08
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-051vote682362
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-051vote5b6464
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-051vote5b81dc

Bill Comments

feedback