CO SB042 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Foreign Asst Med Professor Renew Physician License

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreign Asst Med Professor Renew Physician License

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-25SenateSent to the Governor
2013-04-19SenateGovernor Action - Signed
2013-03-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-03-22HouseHouse Second Reading Passed
2013-03-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-03-14HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-02-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment
2013-02-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-02-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed
2013-02-06SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-01-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7648BCF796BA356F87257AEE0057BB04?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7648BCF796BA356F87257AEE0057BB04/$FILE/042_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7648BCF796BA356F87257AEE0057BB04/$FILE/042_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7648BCF796BA356F87257AEE0057BB04/$FILE/042_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7648BCF796BA356F87257AEE0057BB04/$FILE/042_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7648BCF796BA356F87257AEE0057BB04/$FILE/042_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7648BCF796BA356F87257AEE0057BB04/$FILE/042_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2FB83FC6CAF8078187257B0A005C9A8F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1ACA1CAF1025C63787257B2E006D3A0D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2FB83FC6CAF8078187257B0A005C9A8F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1ACA1CAF1025C63787257B2E006D3A0D

Bill Comments 750

feedback