CO SB042 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child Support Requirements & Federal Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support Requirements & Federal Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 12-042 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 12-042 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-042 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-042 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Governor Action - Signed
2012-03-12 Sent to the Governor
2012-03-05 House Third Reading Passed
2012-03-02 House Second Reading Passed
2012-02-28 House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-02-16 Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2012-02-14 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-02-13 Senate Second Reading Passed
2012-02-02 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-02-01 Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-01-11 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB16C16353AD5E0687257981007F3980?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB16C16353AD5E0687257981007F3980/$FILE/042_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB16C16353AD5E0687257981007F3980/$FILE/042_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB16C16353AD5E0687257981007F3980/$FILE/042_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB16C16353AD5E0687257981007F3980/$FILE/042_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB16C16353AD5E0687257981007F3980/$FILE/042_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB16C16353AD5E0687257981007F3980/$FILE/042_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4F3CF1ECAFC4BFC08725799800058DB9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4F3CF1ECAFC4BFC08725799800058DB9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4F0A39FBAF74B35B872579B20081CB46
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4F0A39FBAF74B35B872579B20081CB46

Bill Comments 750

feedback