CO SB040 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Motorcycle Safety Education Program Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorcycle Safety Education Program Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
2010-05-04 House Committee on Transportation & Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2010-03-23 House Committee on Transportation & Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2010-02-17 Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2010-02-15 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-02-12 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-02-05 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-02-02 Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-01-13 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/442B940EE3948C7C872576A8002BC05B?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/442B940EE3948C7C872576A8002BC05B/$FILE/040_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/442B940EE3948C7C872576A8002BC05B/$FILE/040stra_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/442B940EE3948C7C872576A8002BC05B/$FILE/040_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/442B940EE3948C7C872576A8002BC05B/$FILE/040_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0D3F1A393EA5DA6B872576BE00762BA4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BB0DC5F933F194E68725771F005C326E

Bill Comments 750

feedback