CO SB030 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Governor Became Law
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Governor Became Law
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning creating a working group to develop a definition of recidivism.
Title
Recidivism Definition Working Group
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-030 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-030 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-030 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-030 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Governor Became Law | |
2024-02-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |