CO SB027 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enactment of the "Enhanced Nurse Licensure Compact", and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Enhanced Nurse Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-027 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-027 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.001) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-027 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-027 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-027 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.001) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-027 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Governor Signed | |
2018-01-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-01-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-01-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-16 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |