CO SB027 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
RTD Mass Transit Station Parking Facilities
Title
RTD Mass Transit Station Parking Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Todd [D] | Sen. Kevin Priola [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A). The vote was laid over until later in the meeting. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A). The vote was laid over until later in the meeting. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A). The vote was laid over until later in the meeting. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A). The vote was laid over until later in the meeting. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |