CO SB024 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-20)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-20)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to strengthen the crime of intimidating a witness.
Title
Intimidating A Witness Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: This is a conceptual amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-024 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: This is a conceptual amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |