CO SB006 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Identification Documents Reduce Poverty
Title
Identification Documents Reduce Poverty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-006, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-05 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-29 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-28 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-27 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-23 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-15 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-04 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations |