CO SB002 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designate BOCES As Local Education Agencies
Title
Designate BOCES As Local Education Agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-25 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |