CO HJR1019 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-24)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-24)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the declaration of February 29, 2024, as Rare Disease Day.
Title
February 29 Rare Disease Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |