CO HJR1017 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the presence of women on corporate boards.
Title
Increase Presence Of Women On Corporate Boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2017-03-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |