CO HJR1005 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-38)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the designation of March 23, 2021, as "Colorado Agriculture Day".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

March 23 Colorado Agriculture Day

Sponsors

Rep. Jennifer Arndt [D]Rep. Marc Catlin [R]Sen. Kerry Donovan [D]Sen. Jerry Sonnenberg [R]
Rep. Lisa Cutter [D]Rep. Richard Holtorf [R]Rep. Susan Lontine [D]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]
Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]Rep. Rod Pelton [R]Rep. Dylan Roberts [D]Rep. Donald Valdez [D]
Rep. Perry Will [R]Rep. Judith Amabile [D]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]Rep. Mark Baisley [R]
Rep. Adrienne Benavidez [D]Rep. Tracey Bernett [D]Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R]
Rep. Mary Bradfield [R]Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D]Rep. Lindsey Daugherty [D]Rep. Daneya Esgar [D]
Rep. Thomas Exum [D]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]Rep. Alec Garnett [D]Rep. Tim Geitner [R]
Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Matt Gray [D]Rep. Ron Hanks [R]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]
Rep. Edith Hooton [D]Rep. Dominique Jackson [D]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]
Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]Rep. Colin Larson [R]Rep. Stephanie Luck [R]Rep. Michael Lynch [R]
Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Hugh McKean [R]Rep. Kyle Mullica [D]Rep. Patrick Neville [R]
Rep. David Ortiz [D]Rep. Andres Pico [R]Rep. Kim Ransom [R]Rep. Janice Rich [R]
Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Shane Sandridge [R]Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Marc Snyder [D]
Rep. Matt Soper [R]Rep. Tom Sullivan [D]Rep. Kerry Tipper [D]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]
Rep. Alex Valdez [D]Rep. Tonya Van Beber [R]Rep. Kevin Van Winkle [R]Rep. Michael Weissman [D]
Rep. Dave Williams [R]Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]Rep. Dan Woog [R]Rep. Mary Young [D]
Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]Sen. James Coleman [D]Sen. John Cooke [R]
Sen. Donald Coram [R]Sen. Stephen Fenberg [D]Sen. Rhonda Fields [D]Sen. Leroy Garcia [D]
Sen. Bob Gardner [R]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Chris Hansen [D]
Sen. Dennis Hisey [R]Sen. Chris Holbert [R]Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R]
Sen. Chris Kolker [D]Sen. Pete Lee [D]Sen. Larry Liston [R]Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]
Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D]Sen. Kevin Priola [R]Sen. Robert Rankin [R]
Sen. Robert Rodriguez [D]Sen. Ray Scott [R]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]Sen. Jim Smallwood [R]
Sen. Tammy Story [D]Sen. Faith Winter [D]Sen. Rob Woodward [R]Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-03-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-24SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-03-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to
2021-03-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-23HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-03-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback