CO HB1422 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financing Public Schools
Title
Financing Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt draft report CLHB1422.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt draft report CLHB1422.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001. Ruled not under title by chair (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion failed on a vote of 3-8. (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt draft report CLHB1422.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1422, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001. Ruled not under title by chair (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion failed on a vote of 3-8. (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-10 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2016-05-10 | House | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2016-05-09 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |
2016-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/04/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-03-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |