CO HB1401 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Governor Became Law
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Governor Became Law
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retail Food Establishment Licensure & Inspection
Title
Retail Food Establishment Licensure & Inspection
Sponsors
Rep. KC Becker [D] | Sen. Laura Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1401 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1401 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1401 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1401 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Governor Became Law |
2016-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2016-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |