CO HB1386 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Necessary Document Program
Title
Necessary Document Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1386, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-07 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |