CO HB1356 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the temporary authority of the Colorado economic development commission to allow certain businesses to treat specific existing income tax credits differently.
Title
Treat Economic Development Income Tax Credits Differently
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1356 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1356 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1356, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1356, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1356, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1356 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1356, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1356, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1356, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |