CO HB1347 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the payment of the expenses of the legislative department.
Title
FY 2024-25 Legislative Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Adopt Report (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1347 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1347 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Adopt Report (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1347 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1347 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2024-03-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2024-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |