CO HB1343 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/12/2016 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/12/2016 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Waivers For Charter Schools
Title
Waivers For Charter Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed on a vote of 6-5. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1343 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed on a vote of 6-5. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1343 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1343 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed on a vote of 6-5. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1343, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1343 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/12/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-09 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-04-25 | House | House Committee on Education Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |