CO HB1339 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create Hazardous Substance Site Response Fund
Title
Create Hazardous Substance Site Response Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Gerou [R] | Sen. Mary Hodge [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1339 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1339 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1339 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-31 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-30 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2014-04-30 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2014-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |