CO HB1318 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an annual report on pharmaceutical costs.
Title
Division Of Insurance Annual Report Pharmaceutical Costs Data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1318, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1318 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1318 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1318, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1318, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1318 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1318 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1318, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1318, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/28/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |