CO HB1305 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to programs to benefit students who earn postsecondary course credit while enrolled in high school.
Title
Changes for Concurrent Enrollment Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1305 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1305, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1305, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1305 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1305, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1305, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2024-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |