CO HB1290 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Stop Police Interference Cop Incident Recordings
Title
Stop Police Interference Cop Incident Recordings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1290 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider House Bill 15-1290 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1290, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1290, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider House Bill 15-1290 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1290, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1290, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-01 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-31 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |