CO HB1288 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-6)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-6)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning fair access to insurance coverage for persons unable to obtain insurance coverage for their real property.
Title
Fair Access To Insurance Requirements Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 23-1288 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment E) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment G) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 23-1288 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment E) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment G) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2023-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-17 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |