CO HB1278 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that contractors for public projects over five hundred thousand dollars that are not funded using federal money use apprentices for the parts of the project that are performed by workers in an apprenticeable occupation.
Title
Apprentice Utilization In Public Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1278 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1278 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1278 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |