CO HB1274 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the beneficial use of unused state-owned real property, and, in connection therewith, directing the department of personnel to inventory such property and use such property to promote affordable housing, child care, public schools, residential mental and behavioral health care, and renewable energy development.
Title
Unused State-owned Real Property Beneficial Use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-29 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |