CO HB1270 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the consent of one parent for a licensed professional person to treat a minor for a behavioral health disorder.
Title
One Parent Consent For Behavioral Health Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1270 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |