CO HB1262 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the authority of the director of the division of workers' compensation to impose fines on an employer for a subsequent failure to carry workers' compensation insurance within a specified period after a previous failure, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendation in the 2021 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Continue Workers' Compensation Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1262 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1262 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1262 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1262 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2022-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-16 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |