CO HB1257 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elim Penalty To Increase Compliance Cigarette Sale
Title
Elim Penalty To Increase Compliance Cigarette Sale
Sponsors
Rep. KC Becker [D] | Sen. Kevin Priola [D] | Sen. Mary Hodge [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1257 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1257 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1257 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1257 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1257 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2015-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-01 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Finance |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government + Finance |