CO HB1255 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning procedures for a domestic abuser upon the issuance of a protection order, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protection Order Issued Against Domestic Abuser

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1255 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1255 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.013) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.011) (Y: 27 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1255, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-25SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2021-05-13HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-12HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-13HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1255
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1255_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1255_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1255_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1255_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1255_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1255_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.009.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.012.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1255_L.011.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1255_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1255_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1255_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1255_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ed458723c7e9455a872586b60069315d-hb21-1255-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b1aa8fa7e87102ff872586ce00560ce8-hb21-1255-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b1aa8fa7e87102ff872586ce00560ce8-hb21-1255-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1255vote652705
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1255vote654724
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1255vote656500
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1255vote6581af
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1255vote53f572
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c1058e3370397484872586e1001f2b67-hb21-1255-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/99a3034a781f94bb872586e30051b841-hb21-1255-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1255vote5f5f25

Bill Comments 750

feedback