CO HB1247 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce Tobacco Settlement Accelerated Payments
Title
Reduce Tobacco Settlement Accelerated Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended, recommend consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended, recommend consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended, recommend consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-02 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations | |
2012-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-17 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |