CO HB1234 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - House Second Reading Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - House Second Reading Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Fair Settle Ins Claim Medical Benefits
Title
Fair Settle Ins Claim Medical Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | House Second Reading Lost with Amendments | |
2010-04-19 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-05 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-23 | House Second Reading Re-referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-08 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |