CO HB1224 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-13)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning modifications to the provisions governing foreclosure sales of real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modification To Statutes Governing Foreclosure Of Real Property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-04-26SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-04-23SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-22SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2021-04-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-07HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-01HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1224
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1224_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1224_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1224_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1224_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1224_rer.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1224_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1224_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1224_00.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4025f516e90647ab872586aa007cb5da-hb21-1224-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1224vote5670ba
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4025f516e90647ab872586aa007cb5da-hb21-1224-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/08c76280b4a9f7f8872586bc006b7d34-hb21-1224-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1224vote53baee
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1224vote5834a9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1224vote584cba

Bill Comments 750

feedback