CO HB1222 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-24)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-24)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning aligning local governing authority regulations to expand opportunities to access child care in family child care homes.
Title
Regulation Of Family Child Care Homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1222 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1222 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-04-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |