CO HB1218 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requiring that a health-care facility inform patients as part of the informed consent process of services that the health-care facility refuses to provide to patients when the refusal is for nonmedical reasons, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Health Facility Patient Information Denied Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1218 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment L). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1218 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment L). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2023-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-17 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |