CO HB1202 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an income tax credit for an employer related to an employee's paid leave of absence for the purpose of making an organ donation, and, in connection therewith, enacting the "Living Organ Donor Support Act".
Title
Income Tax Credit Leave Of Absence Organ Donation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1202 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1202 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1202 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1202 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1202 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1202 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |