CO HB1195 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a credit against the state income tax to promote contributions to nonprofit organizations engaged in the development of affordable housing for home ownership.
Title
Tax Credit Contributions Organizations Affordable Housing
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Pabon [D] | Sen. Jeff Bridges [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1195 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1195 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1195 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |