CO HB1187 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-10)
Status: Passed on May 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-10)
Status: Passed on May 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the implementation of case management redesign to ensure conflict-free case management for members eligible for long-term services and supports under the medicaid program.
Title
Long-term Services And Support Case Management Redesign
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1187 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1187 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-01 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2021-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-26 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |