CO HB1171 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Evidence In Sexual Assault Cases Rules
Title
Medical Evidence In Sexual Assault Cases Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1171 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1171 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1171 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1171 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1171 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1171 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1171 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |