CO HB1155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the sales and use tax statutes in order to address certain defects and anachronisms.
Title
Sales Tax Statute Modifications To Address Defects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1155 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1155 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2021-03-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |