CO HB1145 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of laws regulating ballot issue petition circulators that have been permanently enjoined from enforcement.
Title
Enjoined Laws On Ballot Issue Petition Circulators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1145 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1145 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |