CO HB1142 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the expansion of the state income tax subtraction for social security benefits.
Title
Reduce Income Tax Social Security Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1142 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1142 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1142 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment M). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment L). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment K). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1142 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1142 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1142 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment M). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment L). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment K). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |