CO HB1107 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-7)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-7)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding for crime victim services.
Title
Crime Victim Services Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1107 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 as amended by L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1107, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1107 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 as amended by L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1107, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2023-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |