CO HB1104 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-12)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning extending the renewal period for professional educator licenses from five to seven years, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Educator Licensure Renewal Period

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1104 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1104 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1104 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1104, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1104, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Governor Signed
2021-06-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-01HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-25HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to Finance
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1104
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1104_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1104_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1104_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1104_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1104_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1104_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1104_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1104_J.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1104_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1104_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1104_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1104_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1104_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1104_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7c9067047bab2164872586a3007527fc-hb21-1104-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd8f3c4b4444f5c0872586aa00675851-hb21-1104-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7c9067047bab2164872586a3007527fc-hb21-1104-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0d8cffafa0e053a5872586c0004e2aa9-hb21-1104-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0d8cffafa0e053a5872586c0004e2aa9-hb21-1104-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1104vote5b76dc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1d6b3ceb0d21966d872586cc00717e62-hb21-1104-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/abe134ed1ee8688a872586e3004f3e82-hb21-1104-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1104vote5d3624

Bill Comments 750

feedback