CO HB1087 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that the state controller promulgate fiscal rules governing advance payment for the purchase of state agricultural products by a charitable food organization using state grant money.
Title
Fiscal Rule Advance Payment Charitable Food Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1087 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1087 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Governor Signed | |
2023-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2023-02-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-02-09 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |