CO HB1079 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Monetary Amount Limited Offering Securities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Monetary Amount Limited Offering Securities

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseGovernor Signed
2014-03-19HouseSent to the Governor
2014-03-19HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-02-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-02-24SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-02-19SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-02-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2014-02-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-02-03HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-01-28HouseHouse Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-01-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/322BBC9B699E9F1687257C360075E6C3?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/322BBC9B699E9F1687257C360075E6C3/$FILE/1079_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/322BBC9B699E9F1687257C360075E6C3/$FILE/1079_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/322BBC9B699E9F1687257C360075E6C3/$FILE/1079_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/322BBC9B699E9F1687257C360075E6C3/$FILE/1079_rv3.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/322BBC9B699E9F1687257C360075E6C3/$FILE/1079_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/322BBC9B699E9F1687257C360075E6C3/$FILE/1079_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CA3C8CC4547C80BE87257C6E007F2799
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4B76EA5298C5720C87257C840072FC46
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CA3C8CC4547C80BE87257C6E007F2799
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4B76EA5298C5720C87257C840072FC46

Bill Comments 750

feedback