CO HB1077 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Raise Cap Oil Gas Conservation & Env Response Fund
Title
Raise Cap Oil Gas Conservation & Env Response Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Gerou [R] | Sen. Mary Hodge [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-19 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2014-01-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-23 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |