CO HB1076 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning creating a program to recognize public schools that provide certain services to military-connected families, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Purple Star School Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1076 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1076 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1076 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2024-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-31 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |