CO HB1071 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-12)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-12)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of a licensed psychologist to prescribe psychotropic medication for the treatment of mental health disorders.
Title
Licensed Psychologist Prescriptive Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1071, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment F). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment E). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1071, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment F). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment E). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Governor Signed | |
2023-03-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-02-24 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2023-02-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-02-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/08/2023 - No Amendments |
2023-02-01 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |